KS HB2478 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating certain definitions and requirements of the third party administrators act.
Title
Updating certain definitions and requirements of the third party administrators act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-24 | House | House Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2020-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2020-01-29 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 29, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 212-N |
2020-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2020-01-23 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2478/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2478_00_0000.pdf |