KS HB2474 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the requirement for district courts to mail marriage certificate information to the secretary of health and environment.
Title
Removing the requirement for district courts to mail marriage certificate information to the secretary of health and environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 01, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-07 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-02 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 22, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2018-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-17 | House | House Introduced |