KS HB2469 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain claims handling operations from certain local ordinances and restrictions during an emergency or catastrophe.
Title
Exempting certain claims handling operations from certain local ordinances and restrictions during an emergency or catastrophe.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 546-S |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2018-02-09 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 8, 2018 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-08 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-01-23 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance |
2018-01-18 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 18, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 281-N |
2018-01-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2018-01-12 | House | House Introduced |