KS HB2467 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removing the spousal exception from sexual battery and requiring a domestic violence offender assessment on a first conviction of domestic battery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing the spousal exception from sexual battery and requiring a domestic violence offender assessment on a first conviction of domestic battery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-07 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 105 Nay: 15 (Y: 105 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-10SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2020-02-07HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 105 Nay: 15
2020-02-07HouseHouse Engrossed on Thursday, February 6, 2020
2020-02-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2020-02-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Holscher was adopted
2020-02-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Holscher
2020-01-28HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-27HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, January 27, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2020-01-23HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-23HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback