KS HB2462 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the standing committee membership requirements for members of the joint committee on state-tribal relations.
Title
Removing the standing committee membership requirements for members of the joint committee on state-tribal relations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, March 18, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-03-09 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-03-02 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-02-21 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 21, 2022, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2022-01-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-01-10 | House | House Introduced |
2022-01-10 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Monday, January 3, 2022 |