KS HB2459 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the Kansas health act and creating a universal single-payer guaranteed healthcare coverage program.
Title
Enacting the Kansas health act and creating a universal single-payer guaranteed healthcare coverage program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2022-01-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2022-01-10 | House | House Introduced |
2021-05-26 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Wednesday, December 15, 2021 |