KS HB2459 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 2, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the Kansas standard asset seizure and forfeiture act and establishing the Kansas asset seizure and forfeiture repository.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the Kansas standard asset seizure and forfeiture act and establishing the Kansas asset seizure and forfeiture repository.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Faust-Goudeau was rejected - Yea: 13 Nay: 26 (Y: 13 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 110 Nay: 7 (Y: 110 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Monday, April 2, 2018
2018-03-29HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Thursday, March 29, 2018
2018-03-22SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2018-03-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2018-03-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Faust-Goudeau was rejected Yea: 13 Nay: 26
2018-03-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Faust-Goudeau
2018-03-15SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-14SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2018-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-22SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2018-02-22HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 110 Nay: 7
2018-02-21HouseHouse Engrossed on Wednesday, February 21, 2018
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-02-12HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2018-01-24HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N
2018-01-11HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-01-11HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback