KS HB2457 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring boards of education of school districts to increase the compensation of classroom teachers based upon annual school district budget increases.
Title
Requiring boards of education of school districts to increase the compensation of classroom teachers based upon annual school district budget increases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2022-01-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2022-01-10 | House | House Introduced |
2021-05-26 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, November 16, 2021 |