KS HB2456 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the definition of the term "possession" in the Kansas criminal code.
Title
Clarifying the definition of the term "possession" in the Kansas criminal code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 1 (Y: 124 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2020-02-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 1 |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2020-02-25 | House | House Representative Jennings raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge |
2020-02-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2020-02-03 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 3, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2020-01-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2020-01-21 | House | House Introduced |