KS HB2451 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending Kansas department of agriculture division of animal health license, permit and registration renewal deadlines.
Title
Amending Kansas department of agriculture division of animal health license, permit and registration renewal deadlines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 159-S |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2020-02-20 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2020-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture |
2020-01-29 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 29, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2020-01-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2020-01-16 | House | House Introduced |