KS HB2449 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that all members of statutory boards or commissions who are authorized by statute to receive compensation shall receive the amount of per diem compensation paid to legislators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing that all members of statutory boards or commissions who are authorized by statute to receive compensation shall receive the amount of per diem compensation paid to legislators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-27 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 111 Nay: 11 (Y: 111 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-30SenateSenate Died in Senate Committee
2023-03-29SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2023-03-28SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2023-03-27HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 111 Nay: 11
2023-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2023-03-23HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-14HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 14, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 112-N
2023-03-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-07HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback