KS HB2449 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the requirements for board of indigents' defense services appointments.
Title
Changing the requirements for board of indigents' defense services appointments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 99 Nay: 23 (Y: 99 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2020-02-20 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 99 Nay: 23 |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2020-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-23 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 23, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2020-01-21 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 21, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-01-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-16 | House | House Introduced |