KS HB2447 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changing how two-way electronic audio-visual communication is used in courts.
Title
Changing how two-way electronic audio-visual communication is used in courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 83 Nay: 39 (Y: 83 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, May 18, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 346-S |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 18, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2020-02-20 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 83 Nay: 39 |
2020-02-20 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 20, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Warren was rejected |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Warren |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-23 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 23, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2020-01-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-16 | House | House Introduced |