KS HB2443 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing an employment preference for persons with a disability for state government positions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing an employment preference for persons with a disability for state government positions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-23HouseHouse Died on Calendar
2021-03-29HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2021-03-23HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 23, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELED
2021-03-18HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2021-03-18HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback