KS HB2443 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring resident tuition rates for certain Native American students at public postsecondary educational institutions.
Title
Requiring resident tuition rates for certain Native American students at public postsecondary educational institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 29, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 281-N |
2020-01-15 | House | House Referred to Committee on Higher Education Budget |
2020-01-15 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2443/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2443_00_0000.pdf |