KS HB2440 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the election of county appraisers.
Title
Providing for the election of county appraisers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 19, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2020-01-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2020-01-14 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2440/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2440_00_0000.pdf |