KS HB2437 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the use of identifiable meat terms on labels of meat analogs without either an accompanying disclaimer that the product does not contain meat or the inclusion of the word “imitation” before the name of the meat food product being imitated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the use of identifiable meat terms on labels of meat analogs without either an accompanying disclaimer that the product does not contain meat or the inclusion of the word “imitation” before the name of the meat food product being imitated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture
2020-03-05HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Agriculture
2020-02-26HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-06HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture
2020-01-23HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, January 23, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
2020-01-13HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Agriculture
2020-01-13HouseHouse Introduced
2020-01-13HouseHouse Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 10, 2020

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback