KS HB2437 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 38 Nay: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

National day of the cowboy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National day of the cowboy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15SenateSenate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 38 Nay: 0
2018-02-12SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2018-02-08SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 08, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
2018-01-30SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2018-01-29SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2018-01-29HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
2018-01-24HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2018-01-23HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 346-S
2018-01-08HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2018-01-08HouseHouse Introduced
2018-01-08HouseHouse Prefiled for Introduction on Wednesday, December 06, 2017

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback