KS HB2436 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designating a portion of United States highway 69 as the Brandon Collins memorial highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a portion of United States highway 69 as the Brandon Collins memorial highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateSenate Died in Senate Committee
2018-03-01SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 01, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 546-S
2018-02-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2018-02-14SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2018-02-14HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
2018-02-09HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2018-02-08HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 08, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 582-N
2018-01-08HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2018-01-08HouseHouse Introduced
2018-01-08HouseHouse Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, November 16, 2017

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback