KS HB2435 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, March 20, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Kansas 911 act; audits by legislative post audit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kansas 911 act; audits by legislative post audit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Tuesday, March 20, 2018
2018-03-16HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 16, 2018
2018-03-08SenateSenate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 38 Nay: 0
2018-03-02SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2018-02-28SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 28, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 548-S
2018-02-20SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Utilities
2018-02-19SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2018-02-19HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-31HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, January 31, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 112-N
2018-01-08HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-08HouseHouse Introduced
2018-01-08HouseHouse Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, November 16, 2017

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback