KS HB2431 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the rural opportunity zone program by changing the definition of rural opportunity zone, expanding eligibility for program participants, adding down payment assistance as a benefit under such program, providing for a two-track program and establishing a new rural community building program option.
Title
Expanding the rural opportunity zone program by changing the definition of rural opportunity zone, expanding eligibility for program participants, adding down payment assistance as a benefit under such program, providing for a two-track program and establishing a new rural community building program option.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 17, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 218-N |
2021-03-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development |
2021-03-11 | House | House Introduced |