KS HB2427 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a Kansas income tax subtraction modification for national service education awards.
Title
Providing for a Kansas income tax subtraction modification for national service education awards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 6, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2020-01-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2020-01-13 | House | House Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Monday, December 16, 2019 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2427/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2427_00_0000.pdf |