KS HB2426 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revising cross-references in the civil procedure codes.
Title
Revising cross-references in the civil procedure codes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 114 Nay: 0 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 17, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2020-02-03 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 114 Nay: 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2020-01-27 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 27, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2020-01-21 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 21, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-01-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-13 | House | House Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, December 12, 2019 |