KS HB2426 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 23, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 23, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reconciling amendments to certain statutes.
Title
Reconciling amendments to certain statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-09 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 37 Nay: 2 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 1 (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 1 (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 23, 2017 |
2017-06-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Thursday, June 15, 2017 |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 37 Nay: 2 |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Senate Motion to advance to Emergency Final Action subject to amendment, debate and roll call adopted. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee of the Whole from the Chair. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-06-09 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, June 8, 2017 |
2017-06-08 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 1 |
2017-06-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-06-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-06-08 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-06-02 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-06-01 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, June 01, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 112-N |
2017-05-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-10 | House | House Introduced |