KS HB2426 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
KPERS; definition of compensation for purposes of computing final average salary.
Title
KPERS; definition of compensation for purposes of computing final average salary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in Committee |
2016-01-11 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-05-06 | House | House Hearing: Monday, May 11, 2015, 9:00 AM Room 582-N |
2015-05-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2015-05-01 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hb2426/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hb2426_00_0000.pdf |