KS HB2419 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Motion to Reconsider Failed Yea: 19 Nay: 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Motion to Reconsider Failed Yea: 19 Nay: 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State finances; transfers to and expenditures from the budget stabilization fund; transfers to the pooled money investment portfolio.
Title
State finances; transfers to and expenditures from the budget stabilization fund; transfers to the pooled money investment portfolio.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Motion to Reconsider Failed - Yea: 19 Nay: 21 (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Not passed - Yea: 19 Nay: 21 (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Suellentrop was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 22 (Y: 16 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Not passed - Yea: 19 Nay: 21 (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Suellentrop was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 22 (Y: 16 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Motion to Reconsider Failed Yea: 19 Nay: 21 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Not passed; Yea: 19 Nay: 21 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Suellentrop was rejected Yea: 16 Nay: 22 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Suellentrop |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Denning was adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Denning |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Elliott was rejected |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Elliott |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Helgerson was adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Helgerson |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ralph was adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ralph |
2017-05-05 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-05 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, April 05, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 112-N |
2017-04-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-04 | House | House Introduced |