KS HB2416 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2416 by Committee on Judiciary – Requiring compensation for the use, restriction on use, damage, loss or destruction of property as a result of certain governmental actions, authorizing reimbursement of property taxes levied upon businesses shut down or restricted as a result of certain governmental actions related to contagious or infectious disease in humans and establishing the COVID-19 retail storefront property tax relief act to provide partial refunds to certain businesses impacted by COVID-19-related shutdowns and restrictions.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2416 by Committee on Judiciary – Requiring compensation for the use, restriction on use, damage, loss or destruction of property as a result of certain governmental actions, authorizing reimbursement of property taxes levied upon businesses shut down or restricted as a result of certain governmental actions related to contagious or infectious disease in humans and establishing the COVID-19 retail storefront property tax relief act to provide partial refunds to certain businesses impacted by COVID-19-related shutdowns and restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 26 Nay: 11 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 81 Nay: 40 (Y: 81 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 81 Nay: 40 (Y: 81 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Conference |
2022-03-30 | House | House Representative Mason is appointed to replace Representative Highland on the Conference Committee |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson appointed as conferees |
2022-03-29 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Smith, A. , Representative Highland and Representative Gartner as conferees |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 26 Nay: 11 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Senator Pittman raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was withdrawn |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Warren was adopted |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Warren |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Motion to divide the question; Part 2 rejected. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Motion to divide the question; Part 1 retained. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-10 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 81 Nay: 40 |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Probst was rejected |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Probst |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ohaebosim was rejected |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ohaebosim |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Curtis was rejected |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Curtis |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kuether was rejected |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kuether |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highberger was rejected |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Highberger |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-25 | House | House Hearing continuation: Thursday, February 25, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-24 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 24, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-23 | House | House Introduced |