KS HB2411 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the review of certain rules and regulations by the director of the budget.
Title
Limiting the review of certain rules and regulations by the director of the budget.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2020-02-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-01-23 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 23, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2019-03-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-03-25 | House | House Introduced |