KS HB2401 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an exception to the quorum requirements for shareholder meetings for certain corporations.
Title
Providing an exception to the quorum requirements for shareholder meetings for certain corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2020-03-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be further amended and be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-04 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 4, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2020-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-23 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 23, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2019-03-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-03-19 | House | House Introduced |