KS HB2400 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute for HB 2400 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Regulating the sale and distribution of kratom products as a part of and supplemental to the Kansas food, drug and cosmetic act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute for HB 2400 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Regulating the sale and distribution of kratom products as a part of and supplemental to the Kansas food, drug and cosmetic act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Died on Calendar
2020-02-24HouseHouse Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2020-01-30HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, January 30, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2019-03-18HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-03-18HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback