KS HB2400 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting the corporate education tax credit scholarship program act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the corporate education tax credit scholarship program act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-30HouseHouse Died in Committee
2013-03-14HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
2013-03-13HouseHouse Hearing: Friday, March 15, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 112-N -CANCELLED
2013-03-13HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Referred to Committee on Education
2013-03-12HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2013-03-12HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback