KS HB2399 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax exemption extension for Gove county healthcare endowment foundation, inc.
Title
Sales tax exemption extension for Gove county healthcare endowment foundation, inc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2019-03-19 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2019-03-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2019-03-13 | House | House Introduced |