KS HB2388 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring health benefit plans to cover certain professional services when performed by pharmacists.
Title
Requiring health benefit plans to cover certain professional services when performed by pharmacists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2022-02-23 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Insurance and Pensions; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2021-02-12 | House | House Introduced |