KS HB2387 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 546-S
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 546-S
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing funding for STAR bond districts to replace lost food sales tax revenue, authorizing renovation and construction costs for historic theaters and major amusement parks, including amusement rides, as eligible STAR bond project costs, extending the deadline for the STAR bond report to certain legislative committees, and increasing the financing limit for pay-as-you-go funding for rural redevelopment projects.
Title
Providing funding for STAR bond districts to replace lost food sales tax revenue, authorizing renovation and construction costs for historic theaters and major amusement parks, including amusement rides, as eligible STAR bond project costs, extending the deadline for the STAR bond report to certain legislative committees, and increasing the financing limit for pay-as-you-go funding for rural redevelopment projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 72 Nay: 49 (Y: 72 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-03-01 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, February 24, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 72 Nay: 49 |
2023-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2023-02-16 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2023-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2023-02-09 | House | House Introduced |