KS HB2386 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 10, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for Senate Substitute for HB 2386 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs – Amendments regarding the licensure of professional occupations; licensure, employment and background checks for employees of adult care homes, home health aides and providers of disability services; designating Kansas commission on veterans affairs office employees as safety sensitive positions subject to drug screening.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for Senate Substitute for HB 2386 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs – Amendments regarding the licensure of professional occupations; licensure, employment and background checks for employees of adult care homes, home health aides and providers of disability services; designating Kansas commission on veterans affairs office employees as safety sensitive positions subject to drug screening.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 108 Nay: 11 (Y: 108 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 115 Nay: 8 (Y: 115 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 10, 2018
2018-05-01HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 01, 2018
2018-04-28HouseHouse Engrossed on Thursday, April 26, 2018
2018-04-26HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 108 Nay: 11
2018-04-26HouseHouse Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed
2018-04-26HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-07SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2018-04-07SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-06SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2018-03-29SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Estes, Senator Olson and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees
2018-03-29HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Barker , Representative Highland and Representative Ruiz as conferees
2018-03-28SenateSenate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
2018-03-27SenateSenate Senator Olson raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was adopted
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Olson
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2018-03-22SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2018-01-11SenateSenate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2017-05-08SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2017-05-04SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, May 04, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 152-S - Note room and time change
2017-03-29SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2017-03-28SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2017-03-28HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 115 Nay: 8
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2017-03-17HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2017-03-16HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 16, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S
2017-03-09HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2017-03-09HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2386/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2386_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2386_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2386_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2386_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2386_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170328103400_134051/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180328105403_830131/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180407114916_278320/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180426120549_724728/

Bill Comments

feedback