KS HB2385 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designating the polka as the official state dance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the polka as the official state dance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2020-02-19HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 19, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-20HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-02-20HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback