KS HB2385 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property tax exemption and classification for property used for bed and breakfast purposes.
Title
Property tax exemption and classification for property used for bed and breakfast purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2013-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2013-02-28 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/hb2385/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/hb2385_00_0000.pdf |