KS HB2382 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Tax liens upon personal property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax liens upon personal property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-30HouseHouse Died in Committee
2013-03-06HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 11, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
2013-02-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2013-02-28HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback