KS HB2382 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Thursday, 31 May 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for HB2382 by Committee on Ways and Means - concerning economic development

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for HB2382 by Committee on Ways and Means - concerning economic development

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-20 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 80 Nay: 26 (Y: 80 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 27 Nay: 13 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 91 Nay: 30 (Y: 91 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 91 Nay: 30 (Y: 91 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-01 Approved by Governor on Thursday, 31 May 2012
2012-06-01 Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 25, 2012
2012-06-01 Reengrossed on Monday, 21 May 2012
2012-05-20 Concurred with amendments; Yea: 80 Nay: 26
2012-05-20 Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2012-03-27 Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 27 Nay: 13
2012-03-27 Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
2012-03-27 Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Steineger was rejected
2012-03-27 Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Steineger
2012-03-27 Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2012-03-19 Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means
2012-03-14 Hearing: Friday, March 16, 2012, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
2011-04-28 Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2011-04-27 Received and Introduced
2011-05-10 Engrossed on Tuesday, 05 April 2011
2011-04-01 Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 91 Nay: 30
2011-04-01 Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2011-04-01 Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2011-03-28 Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations
2011-03-14 Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2011-03-11 Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/hb2382/
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2382_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2382_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2382_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2382_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2382_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/year1/measures/odt_view/je_20110401122322_653293/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/odt_view/je_20110401122322_653293/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/odt_view/je_20120327150440_157208/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/odt_view/je_20120520181030_385118/

Bill Comments

feedback