KS HB2380 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2380 by Committee on Ways and Means - Increasing certain registration and title fees on vehicles for services performed by county treasurers and the division of vehicles and decreasing certain fees related to administrative costs and disposition of such fees and eliminating the division of vehicles modernization surcharge.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2380 by Committee on Ways and Means - Increasing certain registration and title fees on vehicles for services performed by county treasurers and the division of vehicles and decreasing certain fees related to administrative costs and disposition of such fees and eliminating the division of vehicles modernization surcharge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 104 Nay: 20 (Y: 104 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-30 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 104 Nay: 20 |
2021-03-30 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, March 29, 2021 |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2021-03-10 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2021-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Insurance and Pensions; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 22, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2021-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2021-02-12 | House | House Introduced |