KS HB2380 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Length of time prior to use of debt collection agencies for delinquent taxes; time for payment of sales and liquor drink tax; liability of person to collect sales or compensating use tax; administration of liquor enforcement tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Length of time prior to use of debt collection agencies for delinquent taxes; time for payment of sales and liquor drink tax; liability of person to collect sales or compensating use tax; administration of liquor enforcement tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
2019-03-12HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
2019-02-19HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2019-02-19HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback