KS HB2376 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring law enforcement agencies to adopt a policy relating to making arrests for violation of a protective order and procedures for separating suspects from the scene for a period of time.
Title
Requiring law enforcement agencies to adopt a policy relating to making arrests for violation of a protective order and procedures for separating suspects from the scene for a period of time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 23, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-12 | House | House Introduced |