KS HB2371 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing cooperation with child support from requirements for food and child care assistance and exempting adults enrolled in school from the 20-hour-per-week work requirement for child care assistance.
Title
Removing cooperation with child support from requirements for food and child care assistance and exempting adults enrolled in school from the 20-hour-per-week work requirement for child care assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Children and Seniors |
2021-02-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 22, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2021-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2021-02-12 | House | House Introduced |