KS HB2371 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for an increase in permit fees for oversize or overweight vehicles and requiring registration for escort vehicle service operators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for an increase in permit fees for oversize or overweight vehicles and requiring registration for escort vehicle service operators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 102 Nay: 22 (Y: 102 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-03-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-03-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 102 Nay: 22
2019-03-27HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, March 26, 2019
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
2019-03-14HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
2019-02-18HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2019-02-18HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback