KS HB2369 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the secretary of transportation to designate toll projects on new and existing highways and changing financing requirements for toll or turnpike projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the secretary of transportation to designate toll projects on new and existing highways and changing financing requirements for toll or turnpike projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 114 Nay: 10 (Y: 114 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-03-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-03-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 114 Nay: 10
2019-03-27HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, March 26, 2019
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Pittman was adopted
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Pittman
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Proehl was adopted
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Proehl
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-20HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 112-N
2019-02-18HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-18HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback