KS HB2366 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring prosecutors to disclose their intent to introduce testimony from a jailhouse witness and to forward information to the Kansas bureau of investigation.
Title
Requiring prosecutors to disclose their intent to introduce testimony from a jailhouse witness and to forward information to the Kansas bureau of investigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 7, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-04-08 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-16 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 16, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-03-10 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-11 | House | House Introduced |