KS HB2366 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - House Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S - CANCELED
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing apparatus operators to provide ground ambulance transportation for certain patients in rural areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing apparatus operators to provide ground ambulance transportation for certain patients in rural areas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S - CANCELED
2019-03-06HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-27HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Rural Revitalization; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-22HouseHouse Hearing: Friday, February 22, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 582-N
2019-02-15HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Rural Revitalization
2019-02-15HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback