KS HB2366 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing apparatus operators to provide ground ambulance transportation for certain patients in rural areas.
Title
Allowing apparatus operators to provide ground ambulance transportation for certain patients in rural areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S - CANCELED |
2019-03-06 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-02-27 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Rural Revitalization; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-22 | House | House Hearing: Friday, February 22, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 582-N |
2019-02-15 | House | House Referred to Committee on Rural Revitalization |
2019-02-15 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2366/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2366_00_0000.pdf |