KS HB2361 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2361 by Committee on Judiciary - Removing the requirement that all district court judges in Douglas county serve on the board of trustees of the law library, authorizing the supreme court to adopt rules establishing specialty court programs, creating the specialty court funding advisory committee and the specialty court resources fund, authorizing courts to order defendants to participate in specialty court programs and allowing expungement of certain convictions when defendants complete the requirements of such programs.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2361 by Committee on Judiciary - Removing the requirement that all district court judges in Douglas county serve on the board of trustees of the law library, authorizing the supreme court to adopt rules establishing specialty court programs, creating the specialty court funding advisory committee and the specialty court resources fund, authorizing courts to order defendants to participate in specialty court programs and allowing expungement of certain convictions when defendants complete the requirements of such programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 113 Nay: 0 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 4 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 4 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, April 4, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 113 Nay: 0 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 4 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2022-03-21 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Owens , Representative Smith, E. and Representative Highberger as conferees |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 25, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-03 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-02-23 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 23, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2021-02-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-02-11 | House | House Introduced |