KS HB2353 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Kansas commission for the United States semiquincentennial.
Title
Establishing the Kansas commission for the United States semiquincentennial.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-24 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 24, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2021-02-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-10 | House | House Introduced |